Financial history THE LONDON CENTRE FOR SPIRITUAL DIRECTION

Charity Number: 1089883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £73.23k £97.81k £115.84k £114.38k £141.37k
Total expenditure £76.45k £111.87k £111.05k £131.41k £128.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A