Financial history HUMAN CARE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1095842
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2006 30/08/2007 30/08/2008 30/08/2009 21/05/2010
Total gross income £40.10k £67.16k £61.19k £44.15k £81.80k
Total expenditure £42.06k £62.33k £52.09k £52.46k £86.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A