Financial history THE UK FRIENDS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF AUCKLAND

Charity Number: 1090141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £113.33k £137.79k £201.33k £225.23k £213.86k
Total expenditure £98.83k £80.79k £273.71k £173.42k £212.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A