Trustees THE UK FRIENDS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF AUCKLAND
Charity Number: 1090141

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC FRANK TRACEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Professor Michael Charles Radcliffe Davies | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bronwyn Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Brook | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Topham | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Barrett | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Seth Rankin | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon Vollemaere | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lady Rosemary Buchanan | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Butler | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Whitehouse | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.