NATIONAL HIV NURSES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the association are as follows : 1.To advance education amongst members of the nursing profession about good nursing practices and to promote improved standards of nursing care of patients with HIV.2.To promote research into the promotion of HIV nursing skills. The objectives are achieved through Annual Conference,Study days,Website,Standards,Audits and Competencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 2003: Standard registration
- NHIVNA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA PANTON | Chair | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hodgson | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darran McAteer | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hilton | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Jeffery | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandla Moses Shongwe | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Reynolds | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Colaco Osorio | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Mcluskey | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kendrick | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daini Flower | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Garry Brough | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY MARSHALL | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.76k | £38.54k | £86.37k | £135.19k | £145.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.35k | £83.00k | £82.39k | £158.80k | £149.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2025 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2025 | 187 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2023 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2023 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2022 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2022 | 377 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1998 29.6.2000, 27.06.2002, 26.06.2003, 17/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION ABOUT GOOD NURSING PRACTICES AND TO PROMOTE IMPROVED STANDARDS OF NURSING CARE OF PATIENTS WITH HIV. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE PROMOTION OF HIV NURSING SKILLS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Medivents Ltd
Spirella Building
Bridge Road
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 4ET
- Phone:
- 01462530069
- Email:
- nhivna@nhivna.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window