THE MASHAMSHIRE COMMUNITY OFFICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the interests of residents and businesses in, and visitors to the Mashamshire region of North Yorkshire, to establish and operate a Mashamshire Community Office and to work in liaison with the Police and other authorities to provide information and services for tourists, residents and businesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,548 from 2 government contract(s) and £107,933 from 7 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justine Brooksbank | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Marshall | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Gaynor Pearson | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Palin | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fuller | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY DAVID IVES KLEMZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN JACQUELINE BRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.61k | £95.19k | £92.03k | £173.78k | £283.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.46k | £78.53k | £100.78k | £100.00k | £104.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £14.00k | £16.45k | £17.38k | £17.55k | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £33.34k | £20.97k | £20.00k | £107.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUN 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR MASHAMSHIRE IN NORTH YORKSHIRE) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE C) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP IN (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES. D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMICAL CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES E) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE F) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
MASHAMSHIRE, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Little Market Place
Masham
RIPON
HG4 4DY
- Phone:
- 01765 680200
- Email:
- info@visitmasham.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window