Financial history THE PSALMS AND HYMNS SUPPORT FUND

Charity number: 1089179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.60k £11.15k £12.17k £12.25k £11.75k
Total expenditure £22.69k £22.20k £22.39k £15.76k £24.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A