THE PORCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since 2001 The Porch has provided a place of safety, change and challenge for Oxford's homeless and vulnerably housed single adults. Through our support work, our cafe serving nutritious subsidized meals, and our range of activities we help members find somewhere to live, reconnect socially, increase self-esteem, acquire new skills, make a contribution and gain employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £55,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 December 2001: Standard registration
- STEPPIN STONE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Tomkys | Chair | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Alden | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
George Currie | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Silkin | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Feeny | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neal Pelham Mallett | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Gilders | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £342.45k | £526.86k | £311.77k | £353.27k | £423.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.18k | £434.46k | £280.63k | £287.28k | £321.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.00k | £68.00k | £61.67k | £56.25k | £55.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £521.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £4.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £402.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £31.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 15 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED 14 FEBRUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG HOMELESS, NEEDY, ISOLATED AND POORLY HOUSED PEOPLE IN THE OXFORD AREA INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF A DAY CENTRE AND/OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF 'SELF HELP' SKILLS, IT TRAINING AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOCIAL SKILLS
Area of benefit
PEOPLE IN THE OXFORD AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Porch
139 Magdalen Road
Oxford
OX4 1RL
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- info@theporch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window