Financial history THE NICKA VASSILIOU CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1089248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £43.76k £26.90k £25.75k £35.73k £49.96k
Total expenditure £20.02k £77.36k £19.55k £21.84k £66.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A