Financial history IOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1090263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £1.15m £642.54k £455.20k £593.92k
Total expenditure £1.33m £1.15m £1.02m £425.78k £575.20k
Income from government contracts £590.36k £348.35k £156.20k £21.74k £45.58k
Income from government grants £86.00k £13.76k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £51.19k £52.72k £0 N/A £73.19k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £952.79k £1.08m £642.49k N/A £392.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £674 £24 £52 N/A £610
Income - Other £76.00k £13.76k £0 N/A £127.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £759.49k £696.77k £540.43k N/A £575.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.16k £5.76k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £572.02k £449.96k £479.10k N/A £0