Financial history SCORTON WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1091834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.39k £22.95k £12.95k £9.89k £9.89k
Total expenditure £7.39k £12.06k £20.41k £9.66k £11.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.34k £6.24k N/A N/A