DEEPLISH COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide a safe, secure and friendly environment for the local community groups provide services those are relevant, efficient, effective and best value for money. reduce crime and disorder and help people to feel safer within our neighborhoods. prevent ill-health and improve local people?s health and well being. support community transport services for local voluntary,community organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £368,640 from 16 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rochdale
Governance
- 14 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD SALEEM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shakila Parveen | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bilal Ali | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Parveen Iqbal | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mushtaq Ahmed | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Parveen Akhtar | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ahmad Rashid | Trustee | 14 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HALL | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ATTIYA MALIK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD SAQIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARSHAD MAHMOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAHUR UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAJ MOHAMMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAGUFTA JABEEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.23k | £198.27k | £203.62k | £253.58k | £410.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.21k | £177.29k | £170.88k | £224.80k | £337.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £6.50k | N/A | £20.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.68k | £140.41k | £96.01k | £204.80k | £368.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE DEEPLISH AREA OF ROCHDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE MAP HELD BY THE ASSOCIATION (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE DEEPLISH AREA OF ROCHDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEEPLISH COMMUNITY CENTRE
HARE STREET
ROCHDALE
LANCASHIRE
OL11 1JT
- Phone:
- 01706860151
- Email:
- info@deeplishcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window