Trustees Grasmere Village Hall
Charity number: 1090563

Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Mary Dixon | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Sharon Elliott Savasi | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Astle | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Harrington | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Johnson | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Magennis | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mosey | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LEECH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.