Financial history EGERTON ROTHESAY

Charity number: 1091089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.28m £5.22m £5.13m £5.37m £5.62m
Total expenditure £4.85m £4.85m £5.09m £5.06m £5.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.68k £24.56k £9.40k £9.23k £8.36k
Income - Other trading activities £5.21m £5.18m £5.11m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £5.34m £5.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.45k £22.44k £17.02k £14.57k £15.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £64.32k £4.85m £76.68k £5.05m £5.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.11k £0 £0 £7.64k £13.82k
Expenditure - Governance £64.32k £68.27k £76.68k £10.80k £51.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.11k £0 £0 £7.64k £13.82k
Expenditure - Other £4.78m £0 £5.01m £0 £13.31k