THE BARTON TURF COMMUNITY CHARITIES

Charity number: 1090381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance of three pieces of land for the benefit of parishioners

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,377
Total expenditure: £761

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Glenn Neave Chair 17 September 2019
None on record
Phillip Drake Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Dr Neil Sanderson Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Andrew Wilton Trustee 06 April 2021
None on record
Helen Claire McFadyen Trustee 14 May 2019
THE ZAMBEZI EDUCATION AND CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Doreen Dean Trustee 26 June 2018
NEW VICTORY HALL
Received: On time
Martin Mills Trustee 29 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.41k £4.80k £9.63k £7.46k £4.38k
Total expenditure £3.49k £1.99k £2.66k £2.89k £761
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 March 2025 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME OF 8TH DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE GREEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BARTON TURF
Area of benefit
BARTON TURF, NORFOLK
Registration history
  • 31 January 2002 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
17 Hunters Close
Blofield
NORWICH
NR13 4LS
Phone:
07855947797
Website:

No information available