Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY ACTION SOUTH EAST

Charity number: 1090806
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 02 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 25 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 24 September 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 11 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 11 September 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 13 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 13 September 2013 On Time