Financial history COMMUNITY ACTION SOUTH EAST

Charity number: 1090806
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/12/2015
Total gross income £210.60k £181.14k £137.01k £134.62k £63.87k
Total expenditure £266.58k £266.58k £171.92k £149.25k £136.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £129.21k £59.73k