Governing document CHRISTCHURCH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 12 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCAITON AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.