FARLINGTON SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of pupils by developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others. Engaging in activities and providing facilities and equipment to advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 February 2003: Standard registration
- FARLINGTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Elena Carter | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Shaxted | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allison Jackson | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Riley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Passam | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.51k | £4.41k | £26.87k | £28.96k | £35.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £678 | £5.54k | £14.51k | £64.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 15 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY:- 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARLINGTON SCHOOL
GUILDFORD ROAD
BROADBRIDGE HEATH
HORSHAM
RH12 3PN
- Phone:
- 01403254967
- Email:
- pta@farlingtonschool.com
- Website:
-
farlingtonschool.com/pta
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window