Financial history THE ELIZABETH ELEANOR GWYNN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1092105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £3.31k £5.77k £3.69k £4.50k
Total expenditure £9.28k £7.30k £13.15k £7.86k £8.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A