LIGHT RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Light Relief helps people by providing practical support or financial help and most of the people that we help are lighting designers or technicians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD ALAN FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW JONATHAN GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK JOHN DOBREE WOODROFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BRIAN BRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142 | £61 | £75 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £95.83k | £78 | £78 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND/OR 2. THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND WELL BEING AND/OR 3. THE RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED OF SICKNESS, OLD AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND/OR 4. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE WITH THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AS WILL FURTHER THE CONVALESCENCE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND, WALES AND THE USA
Contact information
- Address:
-
REDOUBT HOUSE
EDWARD ROAD
EASTBOURNE
BN23 8AS
- Phone:
- 01323524120
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window