Financial history MOORLANDS COLLEGE

Charity number: 1092000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.25m £2.25m £1.97m £2.01m £1.68m
Total expenditure £2.19m £2.23m £2.15m £2.02m £1.93m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £59.92k £120.84k £68.18k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £133.48k £109.93k £107.10k £170.26k £75.11k
Income - Other trading activities £11.73k £1.67k £10.67k £5.57k £5.67k
Income - Charitable activities £2.06m £2.09m £1.84m £1.83m £1.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.60k £2.55k £2.14k £5.94k £11.63k
Income - Other £36.45k £47.47k £13.36k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £40.98k £17.17k £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.17m £2.22m £2.12m £1.99m £1.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.92k £13.19k £29.15k £26.51k £20.11k
Expenditure - Governance £10.95k £10.96k £11.96k £8.06k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0