Financial history MOSTON AND DISTRICT SPORTS AND YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1098573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.76k £14.59k £33.08k £23.68k £40.12k
Total expenditure £22.19k £21.01k £32.77k £21.53k £37.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £7.73k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A