Financial history LIVERPOOL WORLD CENTRE

Charity Number: 1100888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £332.75k £474.37k £191.40k £153.49k £196.11k
Total expenditure £252.22k £501.32k £195.66k £250.06k £163.96k
Income from government contracts N/A £43.65k £10.45k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £266.71k £103.32k £64.94k £23.15k