HAMBLETON AND RICHMONDSHIRE CARERS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer support, advice and information to unpaid carers of all ages including young carers. We provide benefit advice, emotional support, social groups, activities and signposting. Working in partnership with carers we raise awareness of carer issues, contribute to local, regional and national debate and strategy for carers and collaborate with local agencies to strengthen the voice of carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Total income includes £242,197 from 3 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
- 24 August 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1046228 Carers Plus Yorkshire Ltd
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.10k | £281.87k | £289.03k | £271.25k | £272.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £292.10k | £307.50k | £294.34k | £276.15k | £334.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £189.01k | £182.45k | £187.36k | £189.29k | £242.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 02 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE CARING AT HOME FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY, INFIRM OR CHRONICALLY SICK, OR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CARERS) AND THE RELIEF OF SUCH ELDERLY, INFIRM OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS, TOGETHER WITH PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, LEARNING DISABILITIES, OR MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION SUPPORT, TRAINING AND ADVICE FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONGST CARERS AND THE PUBLIC. THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO BE THE DISTRICTS PRESENTLY DESCRIBED AS HAMBLETON AND RICHMONDSHIRE, IN NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
HAMBLETON AND RICHMONDSHIRE, IN NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window