Financial history THE BURFORD TRUST

Charity number: 1093523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £93.91k £85.71k £124.88k £107.13k £105.73k
Total expenditure £128.99k £133.31k £136.85k £25.43k £129.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A