THE BURFORD TRUST

Charity number: 1093523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funded from private donations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £105,733
Total expenditure: £129,155

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George GRANT Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
James GRANT Mr Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Alice Rebecca Waite Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Elaine Kirkland Padwick Trustee 31 July 2018
THE EDMUND GODSON CHARITY
Received: On time
BURFORD ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
TENBURY TRANSPORT TRUST
Received: On time
TENBURY AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE TENBURY DISPENSARY
Received: On time
MR A J DALE Trustee
TENBURY COMMUNITY EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
TENBURY COMMUNITY POOL
Received: On time
TENBURY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Received: On time
The C T Thomas Trust
Received: 32 days late
LODGE OF ST.MICHAEL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
TENBURY YOUTH CAFE
Received: On time
SUSAN ELVIRA BISHOP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £93.91k £85.71k £124.88k £107.13k £105.73k
Total expenditure £128.99k £133.31k £136.85k £25.43k £129.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 17 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 17 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 July 2024 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 12 July 2024 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 June 2023 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 23 June 2023 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 July 2022 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 07 July 2022 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 May 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 May 2021 26 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
38 Teme Street
Tenbury Wells
WR15 8AA
Phone:
01584811899
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available