Financial history THE ALMA MATER LODGE SAMARITAN FUND

Charity Number: 1091802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £2.41k £1.48k £3.09k £2.83k £2.67k
Total expenditure £3.31k £1.25k £2.61k £3.58k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A