Financial history RECORD, THE BIODIVERSITY INFORMATION SYSTEM FOR CHESHIRE, HALTON, WARRINGTON AND WIRRAL

Charity number: 1095859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.77k £97.77k £135.94k £133.47k £154.82k
Total expenditure £84.36k £101.64k £114.31k £139.45k £186.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £14.25k £26.51k £50.04k
Income from government grants £10.02k £14.74k £10.02k N/A £35.18k