SWINDON CIVIC VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN ACTIVITIES THAT THE TRUST HAS ORGANISED IN RELATION TO ITS OBJECTIVES ARE: -+Ç PRODUCTION OF A NEWSLETTER -+Ç ORGANISATION OF A SERIES OF EVENTS AND TALKS TO INCREASE AWARENESS OF THE PROBLEMS AND OPPORTUNITIES FACING SWINDON. -+Ç MONITORING OF PLANNING APPLICATIONS AND TAKING PART IN CONSULTATIONS. -+Ç LIAISING WITH OTHER CAMPAIGNING ORGANISATIONS TO LOBBY ON PLANNING ISSUES ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Swindon
Governance
- 12 December 2002: Standard registration
- SWINDON CIVIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTHA PARRY | Chair |
|
||||
Donald Brunwin | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|||
Stephen Milner | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.23k | £11.05k | £256 | £73 | £63 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £926 | £974 | £6.57k | £903 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 2 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (II) TO RESEARCH, INFORM AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE, THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT AND THE PROCESS OF GOVERNMENT OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF SWINDON AND ITS VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HEALTH HYDRO
MILTON ROAD
SWINDON
SN1 5JA
- Phone:
- 01793520592
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window