Trustees Wolverhampton Heritage Trust

Charity Number: 1093354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fiona Keith-Lucas Trustee 30 October 2023
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
Sara Reader Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Lewis Thomas Hobbs Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Rebecca Louise Catherine Greenhill Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Robin Sellers Trustee 10 January 2019
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
THE WORCESTERSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
WEST MIDLANDS HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time
ANDY FOSTER Trustee
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
EDWARD GRAHAM BARRON Trustee
WEST MIDLANDS HERITAGE TRUST
Recently registered
THE WORCESTERSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
WEST MIDLANDS HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time