Financial history NORTHAMPTON TOWN FC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1092502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £417.37k £550.12k £723.15k £924.49k £1.15m
Total expenditure £395.20k £511.19k £676.37k £873.51k £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.03k £2.47k £10.26k £19.36k
Income from government grants N/A £70.50k £46.44k £35.09k £59.76k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £26.34k £38.64k £17.45k £56.04k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £523.78k £684.50k £906.36k £1.09m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £8 £12 £683 £4.89k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £511.19k £676.37k £873.51k £1.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £12.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0