ENVIRONMENTAL VISION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Envision develops young people's employability by empowering them to tackle real-life social problems. Our main programme is the inter-school competition Community-apprentice which requires young people, primarily from disadvantaged backgrounds, to develop and demonstrate personal qualities whilst working in teams to manage their own community projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£1,078,576
Donations and legacies | £173.96k | |
Charitable activities | £904.61k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,058,378
Raising funds | £107.00k | |
Charitable activities | £951.38k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £107.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £951.38k | |
Retained for future use | £20.20k |
People

23 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
472 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 January 2003: Standard registration
- ENVISION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Shanagher | Chair | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Stuart Richards | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Latesha-Precious Richards | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joy Vyas | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Haligah | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin George Hobkinson | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Saima Yarrow | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Toby Giles Miller | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joanne Cooke | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £865.46k | £798.06k | £744.45k | £884.94k | £1.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £795.51k | £738.14k | £666.90k | £857.56k | £1.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £105.33k | £50.49k | £79.95k | £192.54k | £173.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £760.13k | £747.57k | £656.74k | £692.40k | £904.61k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £7.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £795.51k | £650.69k | £601.28k | £762.11k | £951.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £87.45k | £65.63k | £95.45k | £107.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.75k | £12.49k | £12.27k | £11.83k | £13.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £597.15k | £599.47k | £720.41k | £928.41k | £1.02m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £251.91k | £194.30k | £237.70k | £418.31k | £486.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 June 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 12 June 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND APRIL 2002 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6TH DECEMBER 2002 AND 26 JAN 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CITIZENSHIP AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH ADVANCE THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; PROVIDE POSITIVE ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND COMMUNITY COHESION; ADVANCE THE VOLUNTEERING AGENDA AND RECOGNISING AND SHARING EXCELLENCE IN VOLUNTEERING TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN MATTERS OF ENVIRONMENTAL AND SOCIAL JUSTICE TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS TO PROVIDE TRAINING, CONSULTANCY AND MANAGEMENT SERVICES TO OTHER AGENCIES WORKING TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE FROM SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES ACROSS THE UK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CANOPI, 82 TANNER STREET
LONDON
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 02070961714
- Email:
- vision@envision.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window