Financial history THE MARLER TRUST

Charity number: 1094923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.75k £7.48k £17.11k £24.02k £12.37k
Total expenditure £6.01k £6.50k £16.89k £23.12k £17.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A