Financial history BOLTON LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1095924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.59k £47.43k £19.83k £25.55k £42.50k
Total expenditure £10.22k £42.33k £24.75k £21.99k £25.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A