QUAKER CONCERN FOR THE ABOLITION OF TORTURE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Q-Cat works to raise awareness of the absolute nature of the ban on torture in international law and the actual reality in todays world we aim to educate and inform Quakers, other churches, other faiths and public opinion in general by organising conferences and seminars as well as producing briefings, newsletters and other material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 September 2002: Standard registration
- 16 July 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 16 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1127633 BRITAIN YEARLY MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF...
- Q.S.B.O.P. (Working name)
- QUAKER SCHEME FOR BEFRIENDING OVERSEAS PRISONERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.35k | £6.24k | £6.84k | £1.64k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £772 | £843 | £6.41k | £6.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED 13 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, EDUCATE AND RAISE THE AWARENESS OF QUAKERS, MEMBERS OF OTHER CHURCHES, PEOPLE OF OTHER FAITHS, MEMBERS OF THE GOVERNMENT AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC CONCERNING: THE ABSOLUTE NATURE OF THE BAN ON TORTURE UNDER INTERNATIONAL LAW, THE REALITIES OF THE USE OF TORTURE IN THE WORLD TODAY, INCLUDING DAMAGING EFFECTS ON BOTH VICTIMS OF TORTURE AND TORTURERS, AND THE WIDER EFFECTS OF TORTURE ON CIVIC SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window