Financial history ORD STATTER PAVILION TRUST

Charity number: 1096899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.03k £23.70k £19.85k £10.63k £12.91k
Total expenditure £23.15k £13.95k £8.52k £7.78k £14.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £22.13k £13.00k N/A N/A