TOGS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a range of support services to families who have children/young people with sensory, educational and physical special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torfaen
Governance
- 26 November 2002: Standard registration
- TORFAEN PHAB CLUB (Working name)
- TORFAEN OPPORTUNITY GROUP & FAMILY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN SIMON DAVENNE | Chair | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Olivia Williams | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Joanne Gauden | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
John Ernest Killick | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
STEPHEN JOHN BROOKS | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
Norma Phyllis Parrish | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.57k | £75.78k | £95.86k | £80.27k | £104.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.85k | £62.32k | £77.78k | £102.64k | £107.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2014
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF TORFAEN AND DISTRICT BY BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLE BODIED PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS ESPECIALLY CHILDREN AND FAMILIES. 2. TO RELIEF CHILDREN WITH LEARNING, PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE SAID CHILDREN: AND TO SUPPORT THEIR PARENTS, CARERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS TO ENABLE THE SAID CHILDREN TO HAVE THEIR RIGHTS RESPECTED AND TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS INTEGRATED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY. 3. TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
TORFAEN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Togs Centre
The Highway
New Inn
PONTYPOOL
NP4 0PH
- Phone:
- 01495 751567
- Email:
- togs@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window