Financial history OXFORDSHIRE GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1094648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.51k £2.53k £4.47k £3.69k £5.01k
Total expenditure £4.92k £1.46k £3.88k £3.72k £3.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A