THE PROCLAMATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity of the charity is the advancement of the Christian Gospel and in particular to preach and teach the Gospel of Jesus Christ as set forth in Scripture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon David Pillar | Chair | 27 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Matthew John Fuller | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry John Warde | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathan James Buttery | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Kaye Cox | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|||||
KAREN DAWN SOOLE | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Simon Jeremy Medcroft | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £695.28k | £1.35m | £897.88k | £1.45m | £69.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £846.26k | £3.05m | £1.53m | £6.15m | £191.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £142.95k | £430.47k | £150.36k | £619.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £16.95k | £57.70k | £111.85k | £92.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £469.89k | £855.11k | £618.75k | £734.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £53.05k | £2.81k | £16.93k | £8.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £12.44k | £6.95k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £263.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £468.18k | £3.05m | £1.53m | £6.15m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £2.50k | £2.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.65k | £12.26k | £20.90k | £51.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £378.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18TH APRIL 2002. as amended on 05 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) TO EQUIP CHRISTIAN MEN AND WOMEN TO PREACH AND TEACH THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AS SET FORTH IN THE SCRIPTURE ('THE OBJECTS').
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Proclamation Trust
116-118 Walworth Road
LONDON
SE17 1JL
- Phone:
- 02074070561
- Email:
- enquiries@proctrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window