Financial history SS ROBIN TRUST

Charity number: 1095884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £93.26k £1.30k £10.30k £210.90k £317.78k
Total expenditure £31.38k £4.30k £7.22k £20.42k £50.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A