Financial history Bedford School Foundation Trust

Charity number: 1094232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.00m £1.02m £555.65k £1.35m £2.18m
Total expenditure £649.35k £659.38k £457.46k £599.67k £815.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.43m £504.15k £17.61k £737.98k £1.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £95.23k £34.75k £77.21k £61.67k £49.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £479.50k £460.98k £453.74k £535.61k £1.02m
Income - Other £950 £23.59k £7.09k £11.74k £0
Income - Legacies £1.41m £12.50k £15.61k £305.01k £12.20k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £583.17k £587.43k £380.77k £543.00k £804.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.17k £71.96k £76.69k £56.67k £11.08k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £29.81k £41.20k £39.64k £54.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £439.23k £0 £0 £302.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £71.96k £76.69k £56.67k £11.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0