GENERAL AVIATION SAFETY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works to improve safety in all forms of general aviation via: quarterly magazine 'Flight Safety' - newsletters, - physical safety evenings, seminars, webinars, visits & outside events - production of safety material - special investigations - responding to consultations and delivery of Airspace Infringements Awareness courses approved by the CAA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 October 2002: Standard registration
- GASCO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain Nils Jamieson | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tilling | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Hughes | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell William Mason | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robinson | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Slater | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Walkinshaw | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philip Andrew Hall | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
WG CDR GARY COLEMAN RAF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.22k | £155.75k | £112.76k | £107.99k | £160.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.58k | £152.84k | £135.31k | £134.38k | £165.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £48.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 25 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 6TH MAY 2004 AND 26TH NOVEMBER 2009. as amended on 12 Jun 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO FOSTER THE DEVELOPMENT OF GENERAL AVIATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ("THE UK") ALONG SAFE LINES BY ENCOURAGING COMPETENCE, SAFETY AND GOOD AIRMANSHIP AMONG GENERAL AVIATION PILOTS AND OPERATORS AND ALL CONCERNED WITH GENERAL AVIATION ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCHESTER CITY AIRPORT
MAIDSTONE ROAD
CHATHAM
ME5 9SD
- Phone:
- 01634200203
- Email:
- penny@gasco.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window