FAMILIES MATTER AT HURC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS IN THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PARENTING AND OTHER AREAS OF FAMILY LIFE AND TO BUILD SELF CONFIDENCE AND RESILIENCE. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, TRAINING. ADVICE AND INFORMATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Anne Lee | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Olden | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Tustian | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Alice Margaret Yapp | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Joy Drake | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR P. BLASBY | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY HALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.72k | £43.50k | £24.93k | £43.26k | £56.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.82k | £36.24k | £41.96k | £49.99k | £54.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £8.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.11k | £10.30k | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 2002 AMENDED ON 8 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS IN THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PARENTING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HYTHE TOTTON, BLACKFIELD,FAWLEY ETC
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAMILIES MATTER
HYTHE URC
NEW ROAD
HYTHE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 6BR
- Phone:
- 02380843548
- Email:
- office.fm.hurc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window