Financial history NATURAL SCIENCES COLLECTIONS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098156
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £19.49k £19.49k £17.33k £20.22k £22.07k
Total expenditure £14.68k £14.68k £13.54k £16.50k £19.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.40k N/A N/A N/A