Accounts and annual returns HERTS IN TRUST

Charity Number: 1095277
Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days