Trustees PROFESSIONAL GARDENERS' TRUST

Charity number: 1101169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Hugh Garth Anderton Chair 20 April 2024
None on record
Philip Oostenbrink Trustee 12 April 2025
None on record
Christopher Jon Wardle Trustee 18 January 2025
None on record
Bertie Mycroft Swainston Trustee 20 April 2024
None on record
Natasha Goodfellow Trustee 20 April 2024
None on record
Gemma Sturges Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Helen Louise Seal Trustee 26 March 2022
None on record
George Hudson Trustee 27 March 2021
None on record