Financial history THE JOSEPH ROWNTREE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1098329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £168.03k £91.26k £226.98k £353.81k £302.49k
Total expenditure £126.54k £112.63k £173.30k £565.03k £249.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £28.54k N/A £54.00k N/A