THE JOSEPH ROWNTREE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a thriving, York based, community theatre and social hub, hiring out our space and facilities to groups and individuals, and providing a venue for social activities and meetings likely to benefit the communities we serve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £54,000 from 6 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL MARK SHRIMPTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Samuel Armstrong | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Rebecca Lay | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Dennis | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Humphries | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siona Mackelworth | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Boyce | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sian Goodwin | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEITH STEPHEN BARNES | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susie Young | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|||||
HELEN LOUISE LAY | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA TAIT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GRAHAM HOLIDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.74k | £168.03k | £91.26k | £226.98k | £353.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.59k | £126.54k | £112.63k | £173.30k | £565.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £28.54k | N/A | £54.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MARCH 2003 as amended on 13 May 2019 as amended on 10 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
3. The Charity?s objects (the ?Objects?) for the benefit of the people of York and the surrounding areas (the ?Community?) are: 3.1 The advancement of the arts, education and community through the provision of a theatre and associated facilities and to be a venue for social activities and meetings likely to benefit the Community. 3.2 To facilitate the presentation of arts of all types both by and for the Community. 3.3 To advance the knowledge and understanding of the Community in all of the performing arts by enabling access to them. 3.4 To facilitate training and provide volunteer experience in all aspects of theatre operation and management.
Area of benefit
CITY OF YORK AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAXBY ROAD
YORK
YO31 8TA
- Phone:
- 01904501935
- Email:
- secretary@jrtheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window