WIRRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WDT supports the local community to help improve the overall quality of life, whilst striving to reduce deprivation and poor health through provision of services and resources for use by local people. Improve skill levels whilst motivating people into Education, Training or Employment. Provide accommodation for services that support, engage and develop a sense of wellbeing for local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wirral
Governance
- 09 April 2003: Standard registration
- LEASOWE DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Working name)
- LEASOWE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- LEASOWE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- LEASOWE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Greaney | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Jobson | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Luxon-Kewley | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Owens | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Cardus | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Davies Mrs | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Collinson Mrs | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR RON ABBEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WILLIAM TOWNLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.82k | £244.42k | £216.84k | £333.74k | £142.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.54k | £219.98k | £163.12k | £290.27k | £223.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £59.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.26k | N/A | £157.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 2000. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16TH DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 APR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE CONNECTED WITH URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE NEEDS OF LEASOWE WIRRAL MERSEYSIDE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS 3.1 TO PROMOTE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON PROVIDING ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO GAIN SUCH ACCESS 3.2 TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN RELATION TO CITIZENSHIP SO AS TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND POTENTIAL OF INDIVIDUALS AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 3.3 TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT UPON OR THOSE WHO HAVE ALREADY BECOME SO ADDICTED OR DEPENDENT UPON LEGAL OR ILLEGAL DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION 3.4 TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE:- 3.4.1 PROVISION OF ADVICE AND TRAINING TO UNEMPLOYED INDIVIDUALS CONCERNING UNEMPLOYMENT, SELF EMPLOYMENT, AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CO-OPERATIVE ENTERPRISES AND THE PROVISION OF CV WRITING, JOB SEARCH AND JOB CLUB FACILITIES FOR THEM; 3.4.2 PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE BY WAY OF ACCOMMODATION, CHILDCARE FACILITIES OR ASSISTANCE WITH TRAVEL; 3.4.3 PROVISION OF LAND AND BUILDING AT BELOW MARKET OR SUBSIDISED RENTS TO BUSINESSES STARTING UP; 3.4.4 PROVISION OF CAPITAL GRANTS FOR EQUIPMENT TO NEW BUSINESSES; 3.4.5 PAYMENT TO EXISTING COMMERCIAL BUSINESSES TO TAKE ON ADDITIONAL STAFF FROM AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE. 3.5 TO RELIEVE HOUSING NEED BY:- 3.5.1 THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO THOSE IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF HOUSING NEED; 3.5.2 FACILITATING THE PROVISION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC SECTOR HOUSING THROUGH CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES. 3.6 TO PROVIDE OR PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED THROUGH CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES. 3.7 TO RELIEVE POVERTY 3.8 TO PROTECT, ENHANCE AND CONSERVE THE ENVIRONMENT 3.9 TO PROVIDE PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILD CARE 3.10 TO PROMOTE PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME 3.11 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
LEASOWE WIRRAL MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEASOWE MILLENNIUM CENTRE
TWICKENHAM DRIVE
WIRRAL
CH46 1PQ
- Phone:
- 07701385857
- Email:
- jenni@wirraldt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window